House
|
06/07/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Public Act 18-102
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 476
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2018
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2018
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
File Number 64
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
House Calendar Number 78
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|