House | 05/24/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/15/2018 | Public Act 18-23 | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 308 | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | File Number 181 | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | House Calendar Number 140 | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/09/2018 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
House | 02/27/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |