House | 04/24/2018 | Motion Failed (JF) | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | File Number 431 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | House Calendar Number 301 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/06/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/28/2018 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
House | 02/27/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |