Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05319 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 5319
2-February Session, 2018 *_____HB05319VA____031518____*
1+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 5319
2+February Session, 2018 LCO No. 1792
3+ *01792_______VA_*
4+Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
5+Introduced by:
6+(VA)
37
48 General Assembly
59
6-Substitute Bill No. 5319
10+Raised Bill No. 5319
711
812 February Session, 2018
913
10-*_____HB05319VA____031518____*
14+LCO No. 1792
1115
12-AN ACT CONCERNING PROCEEDS FROM THE SALE OF PROPERTY PRESUMED ABANDONED BY VETERANS' CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS.
16+*01792_______VA_*
17+
18+Referred to Committee on VETERANS' AFFAIRS
19+
20+Introduced by:
21+
22+(VA)
23+
24+AN ACT CONCERNING FUNDS HELD BY VETERANS' CHARITABLE ORGANIZATIONS.
1325
1426 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
1527
1628 Section 1. Section 3-69a of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):
1729
1830 (a) (1) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2005, the funds received under this part, excluding the proceeds from the sale of property deposited in the Special Abandoned Property Fund in accordance with section 3-62h, shall be deposited in the General Fund.
1931
2032 (2) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006, and each fiscal year thereafter, a portion of the funds received under this part shall, upon deposit in the General Fund, be credited to the Citizens' Election Fund established in section 9-701 as follows: (A) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2006, seventeen million dollars, (B) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2007, sixteen million dollars, (C) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2008, seventeen million three hundred thousand dollars, and (D) for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2009, and each fiscal year thereafter, the amount deposited for the preceding fiscal year, adjusted in accordance with any change in the consumer price index for all urban consumers for such preceding fiscal year, as published by the United States Department of Labor, Bureau of Labor Statistics. The State Treasurer shall determine such adjusted amount not later than thirty days after the end of such preceding fiscal year.
2133
2234 (3) For the fiscal year ending June 30, 2019, and each fiscal year thereafter, all proceeds received under this part from the sale of property presumed abandoned by any veterans' charitable organization shall be deposited in the institutional general welfare fund of the Department of Veterans Affairs. As used in this subdivision, "veterans' charitable organization" means any person organized under chapter 602, or any predecessor statutes thereto, or under Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986, or any subsequent corresponding internal revenue code of the United States, as amended from time to time, that holds itself out to be established for any benevolent, educational, philanthropic, humane, scientific, patriotic, social welfare or advocacy purpose relating to or on behalf of veterans.
2335
2436 (b) All costs incurred in the administration of this part, except as provided in section 3-62h and subsection (a) of this section, and all claims allowed under this part shall be paid from the General Fund.
2537
2638 Sec. 2. Subsection (b) of section 9-750 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):
2739
2840 (b) Notwithstanding the provisions of section 3-69a, as amended by this act, if funds are deposited into the Citizens' Election Fund pursuant to the provisions of subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of this section, the aggregate amount of any such deposits shall be deducted from the amount deposited into said fund under subdivision (2) of subsection (a) of section 3-69a, as amended by this act, for the following fiscal year.
2941
3042
3143
3244
3345 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3446 Section 1 July 1, 2018 3-69a
3547 Sec. 2 July 1, 2018 9-750(b)
3648
3749 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
3850
3951 Section 1
4052
4153 July 1, 2018
4254
4355 3-69a
4456
4557 Sec. 2
4658
4759 July 1, 2018
4860
4961 9-750(b)
5062
51-Statement of Legislative Commissioners:
63+Statement of Purpose:
5264
53-Title was changed.
65+To deposit into the institutional general welfare fund of the Department of Veterans Affairs any funds received from the sale of property of veterans' charitable organizations presumed abandoned.
5466
55-
56-
57-VA Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
58-
59-VA
60-
61-Joint Favorable Subst. -LCO
67+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]