Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Public Act 18-179
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 552
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule B,C
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 5617
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5507
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Amendment Withdrawn, House Amendment Schedule A 5339
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2018
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2018
|
House Designated House Amendment Schedule A 5339
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
File Number 190
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
House Calendar Number 149
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|