House | 03/20/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | ||
House | 03/16/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference General Law | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |