House | 03/29/2018 | File Number 125 | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | House Calendar Number 107 | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |