House | 04/12/2018 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/11/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/10/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | File Number 244 | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | House Calendar Number 177 | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/23/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
House | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |