House
|
06/06/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2018
|
Public Act 18-115
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
File Number 622
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 373
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3710
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
File Number 316
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
House Calendar Number 211
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|