House
|
05/22/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Public Act 18-8
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
File Number 644
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 383
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3879
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
File Number 196
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
House Calendar Number 155
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|