House | 04/16/2018 | File Number 497 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | House Calendar Number 340 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/05/2018 | Public Hearing 03/09 | ||
House | 03/02/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |