House | 03/27/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/23/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/20 | ||
House | 03/07/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |