Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2018
|
Public Act 18-184
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 541
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5448
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2018
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
File Number 448
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
House Calendar Number 319
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|