House | 06/07/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/25/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/25/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/23/2018 | Public Act 18-123 | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 04/20/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 375 | ||
House | 04/20/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | File Number 320 | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | House Calendar Number 215 | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/22/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2018 | Public Hearing 03/14 | ||
House | 03/07/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |