House | 03/28/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/27/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/26/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Energy and Technology | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/07/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |