House | 04/16/2018 | File Number 502 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | House Calendar Number 345 | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/16/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |