House | 04/24/2018 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/18/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | File Number 459 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | House Calendar Number 331 | ||
House | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/06/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
House | 03/13/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |