House | 04/30/2018 | Motion Failed (JF) | ||
House | 04/24/2018 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | File Number 581 | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | House Calendar Number 398 | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/04/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/19/2018 | Public Hearing 03/23 | ||
House | 03/16/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |