House | 04/19/2018 | File Number 600 | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | House Calendar Number 402 | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/19/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/13/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/29/2018 | Public Hearing 04/02 | ||
House | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |