Senate | 04/25/2018 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | File Number 23 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 54 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/09/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/28 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |