Senate | 04/12/2018 | File Number 461 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 300 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2018 | Public Hearing 03/16 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |