House
|
06/11/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Public Act 18-137
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 582
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5640
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2018
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
File Number 90
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 74
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/26
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|