Senate | 05/29/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/14/2018 | Public Act 18-15 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | House Calendar Number 490 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | File Number 131 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 106 | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Public Hearing 02/26 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |