House
|
06/11/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2018
|
Public Act 18-141
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 567
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 4558
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5594
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
File Number 93
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 77
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|