Senate | 05/31/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Public Act 18-40 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | House Calendar Number 456 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | File Number 94 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 78 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/16/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |