Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Special Act 18-21
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
House Calendar Number 449
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3772
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
File Number 97
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 81
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|