Senate | 04/09/2018 | File Number 326 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 197 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |