Senate | 04/04/2018 | File Number 208 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 131 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/16/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |