Senate | 04/19/2018 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/18/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | File Number 45 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 64 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |