Senate | 06/01/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/17/2018 | Public Act 18-44 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | House Calendar Number 498 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/02/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | File Number 48 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 67 | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/19/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/23/2018 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |