House
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2018
|
Public Act 18-144
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 570
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4671
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
File Number 158
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 123
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2018
|
Public Hearing 02/27
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|