House
|
06/01/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2018
|
Public Act 18-76
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 571
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4220
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
File Number 211
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 147
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|