Senate | 03/20/2018 | File Number 25 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 56 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/09/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |