Senate | 04/11/2018 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | File Number 160 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 125 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |