Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Public Act 18-147
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
House Calendar Number 539
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5298
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
File Number 573
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 347
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|