Senate | 04/03/2018 | File Number 163 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 128 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |