House | 05/08/2018 | House Calendar Number 578 | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5371 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | File Number 277 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 186 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Public Hearing 03/05 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |