Senate | 04/05/2018 | File Number 283 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 192 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/06 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |