Senate | 05/25/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Public Act 18-69 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2018 | House Calendar Number 543 | ||
Senate | 05/06/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/01/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/30/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/24/2018 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | File Number 335 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 207 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/02/2018 | Public Hearing 03/08 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |