Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Special Act 18-22
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
House Calendar Number 502
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4275
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
File Number 475
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 286
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|