Senate | 06/01/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Public Act 18-55 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | House Calendar Number 460 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | File Number 229 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 153 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/09/2018 | Public Hearing 03/15 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |