Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Special Act 18-8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
House Calendar Number 504
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4903
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
File Number 399
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 230
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2018
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/20
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|