Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2018
|
Special Act 18-25
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
House Calendar Number 551
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5251
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
File Number 230
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 138
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|