Connecticut 2018 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00462 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/06/2018

                            General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 462
February Session, 2018  LCO No. 2204
 *02204_______LAB*
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
Introduced by:
(LAB)

General Assembly

Raised Bill No. 462 

February Session, 2018

LCO No. 2204

*02204_______LAB*

Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES 

Introduced by:

(LAB)

AN ACT CONCERNING TAKE-HOME OR GARAGED VEHICLES.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) Notwithstanding any provision of the general statutes, on or after July 1, 2018, except for any state employee who is covered by a collective bargaining agreement in effect on said date until the expiration of such agreement: (1) No state employee shall be permitted to use any state-owned vehicle that such employee has permission to take home or garage for a purpose that is outside of his or her official capacity as a state employee; and (2) any state employee found to be in violation of this section shall reimburse the state for any damage done to the vehicle, the normal wear and tear incurred by the vehicle, any required maintenance during the period of such private use or any mileage incurred on the vehicle, at the reimbursement rate established pursuant to section 5-141c of the general statutes.

Sec. 2. Subsection (a) of section 5-271 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):

(a) (1) Employees shall have, and shall be protected in the exercise of the right of self-organization, to form, join or assist any employee organization, to bargain collectively through representatives of their own choosing on questions of wages, hours and other conditions of employment, except as provided in subdivision (2) of this subsection and subsection (d) of section 5-272, and to engage in other concerted activities for the purpose of collective bargaining or other mutual aid or protection, free from actual interference, restraint or coercion.

(2) On and after July 1, 2018, "wages, hours and other conditions of employment" shall not include any question related to the use of state-owned vehicles by state employees.

Sec. 3. Subsection (c) of section 5-272 of the general statutes is repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective July 1, 2018):

(c) For the purposes of sections 5-270 to 5-280, inclusive, as amended by this act, to bargain collectively is the performance of the mutual obligation of the employer or his designated representatives and the representative of the employees to meet at reasonable times, including meetings appropriately related to the budget-making process, and bargain in good faith with respect to wages, hours and other conditions of employment, except as provided in subsection (a) of section 5-271, as amended by this act and subsection (d) of this section, or the negotiation of an agreement, or any question arising thereunder, and the execution of a written contract incorporating any agreement reached if requested by either party, but such obligation shall not compel either party to agree to a proposal or require the making of a concession.

Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2018) (a) Within available appropriations, the Labor Commissioner, in conjunction with the Department of Administrative Services, shall study the use of state-owned take-home or garaged vehicles by state employees. Such study shall include the following: (1) A determination as to the amount of state-owned vehicles permitted to be taken home by state employees, (2) a determination as to the amount of employees currently permitted to take home state-owned vehicles, (3) the cost to the state for the maintenance or repair of such state-owned take-home or garaged vehicles, (4) the value of depreciation due to the normal wear and tear of such state-owned take-home or garaged vehicles, (5) the annual number of motor vehicle accidents such state-owned take-home or garaged vehicles have been involved in for a period beginning on July 1, 2010, and ending June 30, 2018, and (6) the value of the benefit of being permitted to take home a state-owned vehicle by public employees.

(b) Not later than July 1, 2019, the commissioner shall report the results of the study, in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to labor and public employees. Such report may include the commissioner's recommendations for addressing any identified findings of abuse of the privilege of being permitted to take home a state-owned vehicle by public employees.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2018 New section
Sec. 2 July 1, 2018 5-271(a)
Sec. 3 July 1, 2018 5-272(c)
Sec. 4 July 1, 2018 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2018

New section

Sec. 2

July 1, 2018

5-271(a)

Sec. 3

July 1, 2018

5-272(c)

Sec. 4

July 1, 2018

New section

Statement of Purpose: 

To prohibit state employees from using state-owned vehicles for personal use.

[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]