House
|
06/14/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Public Act 18-166
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5837
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
House Calendar Number 553
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5305
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
File Number 524
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 329
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|