Senate | 06/01/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/22/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 05/18/2018 | Public Act 18-60 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2018 | House Calendar Number 518 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | File Number 344 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 217 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/26/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/23/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |