House
|
06/13/2018
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2018
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2018
|
Special Act 18-26
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2018
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
House Calendar Number 588
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2018
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2018
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5781
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2018
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2018
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2018
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
File Number 407
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2018
|
Senate Calendar Number 238
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2018
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2018
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2018
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|