House | 06/13/2018 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2018 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/31/2018 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/25/2018 | Public Act 18-154 | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 05/09/2018 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/09/2018 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5977 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | File Number 488 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 293 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/06/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/28/2018 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |