House | 05/08/2018 | House Calendar Number 589 | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/08/2018 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2018 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5641 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | File Number 551 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 336 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/02/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Public Hearing 03/28 | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |