House | 05/07/2018 | House Calendar Number 565 | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2018 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5516 | ||
Senate | 05/07/2018 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 5378 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | File Number 555 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Senate Calendar Number 340 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2018 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2018 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Public Hearing 03/26 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |